HELPING HANDS ESSEX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Currently: To set up accommodation & support services to help people with drink problems in Central Essex. Please note - The charity stopped providing services June 30th 2022 due to loss of funding. An orderly settlement of financial obligations has been taking place since. All remaining clients were placed with similar service providers and all staff found roles locally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 03 December 2009: Standard registration
- HOMELESS ESSEX (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert William Kilvington | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL DAVID BONGARD | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Ricky Maloney | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham Howard Pooley | Trustee | 30 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.01k | £272.64k | £264.21k | £240.93k | £24.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.29k | £204.53k | £242.95k | £299.36k | £86.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £26.45k | £41.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 SEPTEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 FEBRUARY 2010 as amended on 30 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF EMERGENCY AND OTHER ACCOMMODATION, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE FOR PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE DEEMED HOMELESS AND REQUIRE SUCH ACCOMMODATION, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE INCLUDING SIGN-POSTING TO AGENCIES OR ORGANISATIONS OF FURTHER SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Helping Hands Essex
Pinewood House
Burnham Road
Althorne
Essex
CM3 6DP
- Phone:
- 07414037059
- Email:
- ricky@hhe.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window