The Parochial Church Council of the Ecclesiastical Parish of Moseley

Charity number: 1132268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of regular worship open to all

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £309,668
Total expenditure: £367,089

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 June 1989: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S MOSELEY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Angela Jane Hannafin Trustee 10 September 2024
None on record
Neil Alexander McLeod Trustee 15 April 2024
None on record
Karen Jane Walford Trustee 15 April 2024
None on record
Pamela Jane Rhodes Trustee 15 April 2024
None on record
Katherine Jane Stocks Trustee 15 April 2024
None on record
Bridget Jane Langstaff Trustee 15 April 2024
None on record
Robert Harland Brown Trustee 15 April 2024
None on record
John Whiteford David Gray Trustee 15 April 2024
None on record
Thomas Owain Brodie Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Scott James Smith Trustee 24 April 2023
None on record
Rev Magdalen Mary Smith Trustee 10 September 2021
THE KING'S NORTON UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Jill Marigold Adams Trustee 08 August 2021
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHOIRS AND MUSIC MOSELEY
Received: On time
Sabina Bealt Trustee 08 August 2021
None on record
Danielle Zoe Edwards Trustee 08 August 2021
None on record
Stephen Alabaster Trustee 08 August 2021
None on record
Frances May Rowley Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
JEAN LINDLEY Trustee 16 March 2020
None on record
Janet Anne Thorne Trustee 16 March 2020
None on record
Jenny Daniels Trustee 16 March 2020
None on record
ANGELA SUSAN BROWN Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £224.86k £273.76k £337.79k £222.66k £309.67k
Total expenditure £263.52k £265.00k £255.61k £336.59k £367.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 18 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 04 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8 MAY 1989
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RESTORATION, REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE ORGAN OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MARY, MOSELEY IN THE DIOCESE OF BIRMINGHAM IN ANY MANNER THAT MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE THOUGHT FIT.
Area of benefit
ST MARY, MOSELEY
Registration history
  • 21 June 1989 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
St. Marys Parish Office
St. Marys Row
Moseley
Birmingham
B13 8HW
Phone:
01214492243
Website:

moseleychurch.org.uk