Trustees SLOUGH BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1133760
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Audrey Callum Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Jonathan Tettelaar Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Rev Keith Wilson Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Rev DAVID HOWELL Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
TONY TARRANT MBE Trustee 01 May 2017
None on record
MATTHEW WARREN Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
JANE JONES Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
MBUSO NGWENYA Trustee 23 November 2016
None on record
JOHN SHEPHERD Trustee
WINDSOR AND ETON CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time