THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES (HOPE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide religious services and pastoral support for the Parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Salford City
Governance
- 11 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Gareth Mark Thomas | Chair | 18 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Anthony Wood | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hedley | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Jones | Trustee | 28 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr SYLVIA MCGREAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CONSTANCE ELIZABETH WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREVOR PALMER | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARGARET ADSHEAD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.58k | £48.14k | £69.60k | £55.65k | £52.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.25k | £52.11k | £72.13k | £63.63k | £51.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2024 | 178 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2024 | 178 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Leander Close
Eccles
MANCHESTER
M30 8ER
- Phone:
- 01617942702
- Email:
- stjames.hope@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window