Financial history SIDCUP SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1133600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £11.68k £2.66k £15.86k £282.87k £27.27k
Total expenditure £11.63k £2.56k £15.07k £22.84k £23.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A