THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, PURLEY

Charity number: 1133205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Parish Church

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £368,820
Total expenditure: £364,885

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Croydon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 December 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • CHRIST CHURCH, PURLEY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Douglas John Low McHardie Chair 13 May 2019
CAP CROYDON SOUTH
Received: On time
NEIL RUSSELL PENN Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Oluwatomilayo Ehinon Ejedenawe Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
Daniel John Burrows Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Catherine Namatovu Kalanzi BSc Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
AMY FRANCES DANIELS Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Martin Philip Ryan Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Louise Nancy Benn Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Michael Francis Stenning Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Jennifer Skeffington Hird Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Harriet Howgego Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Christopher Bjorn Hickin MA Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Robert David BENN Trustee 15 November 2020
None on record
Tom Griffiths Trustee 15 November 2020
None on record
Indrani Balachandran Trustee 15 November 2020
THE FRIENDS OF THE OLD PALACE, CROYDON
Received: On time
RATNAM KANAGASABAI MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
Alison Frost Trustee 15 November 2020
None on record
Lisa Louise Fairman-Brown Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Rev'd Dr Simon Paul Stocks Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
Nicholas Karl Whitley Trustee
None on record
Richard Hugh Slade Trustee
None on record
Muriel Watts Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £338.38k £316.32k £346.10k £388.55k £368.82k
Total expenditure £355.49k £344.38k £362.04k £374.04k £364.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 24 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 24 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 05 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 PLACEHOUSE LANE
COULSDON
CR5 1LA
Phone:
02087638291