Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S, STOKE NEWINGTON

Charity Number: 1133877
Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicholas Howard Trustee 18 May 2025
None on record
Rev Charis Amelia Enga Trustee 24 March 2025
None on record
Rahul Matthew Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Mark Andrew Perrett Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Michelle Wilkinson Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Lorraine Sanie Trustee 16 May 2023
None on record
Jennifer Lister Trustee 16 May 2023
None on record
Henry Laurence Baker Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Liz Kalu Trustee 30 May 2022
THE OLD CHURCH, STOKE NEWINGTON
Received: On time
Katie Jane Smith Trustee 16 May 2022
PALATINE ESTATE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE STOKE NEWINGTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Esme Rosamund Brooker Trustee 16 May 2022
None on record
Sara Cottingham Trustee 16 May 2022
None on record
Caroline Jane Hutchinson Trustee 16 May 2021
None on record
Philip Diprose Trustee 16 May 2021
None on record
Andrew John McCully Trustee 30 April 2018
THE TEACHING AWARDS TRUST
Received: On time
PALATINE ESTATE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE STOKE NEWINGTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Anne Elizabeth Taylor Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
JUDITH SIMPSON Trustee 06 April 2014
None on record