THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EASTBOURNE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 02 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- EASTBOURNE PARISH CHURCH, ST. MARY THE VIRGIN (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Arwen Mary Caroline Folkes MA | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Thomas Fletcher | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Cooper | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eric Walter Hylton | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Elizabeth Hambly B.Ed Hons | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Avril Patricia Bell | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Forman | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Richard Standen-Payne | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN SIGGS | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Elaine Alexandra Beynon | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin St Clair Devonish | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Stuart Oliphant | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Graham Marsden | Trustee | 24 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
NANCY RANDLES | Trustee | 01 April 1985 |
|
|
||||
NANCY LOUISE RANDLES MBA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN ROBERT ETHERIDGE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £199.50k | £162.82k | £162.82k | £166.86k | £186.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £211.60k | £156.04k | £156.04k | £214.71k | £194.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PARISH OFFICE
THE OLD PARSONAGE
OCKLYNGE ROAD
EASTBOURNE
BN21 1PL
- Phone:
- 01323725722
- Website:
-
stmaryseastbourne.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window