Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARNABAS EALING

Charity Number: 1134041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £177.41k £195.59k £242.43k £251.14k £204.88k
Total expenditure £213.32k £185.05k £211.72k £217.86k £231.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.86k £1.00k N/A N/A