THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS, LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Responsible for the management of the church and all its related activities. Mission Statement: St Martin-in-the-Fields exists to honour God by being an open and inclusive church, that enables people to question and discover for themselves the significance of Jesus Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£7,314,805
Donations and legacies | £1.38m | |
Charitable activities | £789.78k | |
Other trading activities | £5.11m | |
Investments | £29.77k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£7,378,770
Raising funds | £5.19m | |
Charitable activities | £2.19m | |
Other | £0 |
£57,175 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.19m | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.19m |
People

124 Employee(s)
18 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 01 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hiu Tung Chow | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Templeman | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Jane Elizabeth Ware | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Frances Anne Katharine Denniss | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan James Nicholas Edwards | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yen Wai-Yan Leung | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Mary Rhona MacMillan | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Wai Keung Chan | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adenike Awoyinka | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melvene Adams | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeff Alan Claxton | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lois Kate Howarth | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Georgina Jane Morrison | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Daniel Joseph Kaszeta | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sally Ann Hitchiner | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Quill | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|||||
THE REVEREND DR SAMUEL MARTIN BAILEY WELLS | Trustee | 16 July 2012 |
|
|||||
Rev RICHARD CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.54m | £3.88m | £3.84m | £5.59m | £7.31m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.45m | £4.62m | £3.98m | £6.14m | £7.38m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.17m | £1.12m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £566.26k | £1.14m | £1.15m | £1.08m | £1.38m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £5.45m | £2.59m | £2.28m | £3.91m | £5.11m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £483.93k | £126.33k | £386.35k | £581.50k | £789.78k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £32.12k | £29.87k | £28.68k | £22.85k | £29.77k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £6.50k | £3.77k | £185.25k | £13.65k | £92.67k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.41m | £1.42m | £1.61m | £1.77m | £2.19m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £40.61k | £3.20m | £2.37m | £4.37m | £5.19m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.42k | £6.57k | £11.72k | £15.67k | £13.33k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £12.76k | £5.65k | £10.49k | £10.50k | £10.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £305.22k | £536.52k | £456.65k | £379.90k | £315.27k | |
|
Long-term investments | £947.11k | £1.01m | £691.35k | £610.13k | £667.31k | |
|
Other assets | £1.83m | £1.01m | £1.70m | £1.75m | £1.79m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.05m | £1.20m | £1.49m | £2.01m | £2.06m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 April 2021 | 160 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 ST MARTIN'S PLACE
LONDON
WC2N 4JH
- Phone:
- 02077661105
- Email:
- info@smitf.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window