ELECTRIC EELS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Swimming club sepcifically for people, mainly children, with Downs Syndrome. The club teaches children to swim and enters competitive galas. There is also a synchronized swimming part of the club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 22 June 2010: Standard registration
- 15 March 2023: Funds received from 1095655 WINDSOR DEDWORTH MANOR TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAULINE WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.04k | £3.79k | £7.42k | £13.68k | £16.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.17k | £3.82k | £5.76k | £17.59k | £16.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 July 2024 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
2.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CLUB SHALL BE TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF SWIMMING IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF DOWN SYNDROME WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Three Kings Accounting
Suite 3
5 High Street
Windsor
Berkshire
SL4 1LD
- Phone:
- 07930115135
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window