THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MINEHEAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides spiritual and pastoral support for members of the Church of England in the Ecclesiastical Parish of Minehead, Somerset.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

13 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 11 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- MINEHEAD PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martyn John Snell | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Dawn Snell | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane Angela Newton | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Eva Candy | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Marina Evans | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Griffiths | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kath Griffiths | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Newton | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MARY SEYMOUR | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
REVD JOHN MARTIN THOROGOOD | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Catherine Amanda Hazlewood | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Philip Ian Christopher Butcher | Trustee | 04 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ELLEN BOYLES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.97k | £109.20k | £110.97k | £123.68k | £123.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.37k | £131.34k | £99.72k | £120.45k | £120.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 August 2021 | 295 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 August 2021 | 295 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Andrews Church
Wellington Square
MINEHEAD
TA24 5NH
- Phone:
- 01643 818904
- Email:
- mineheadparish@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window