PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE COCKERMOUTH AREA TEAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship with the provision of sacred space for personal prayer & contemplation. Pastoral work, teaching of Christianity. Religious assemblies in local schools. Promoting the whole mission of the church through provision of Christian activities for senior citizens, parents & toddlers, young people & other special needs groups. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,315 from 3 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 05 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- COCKERMOUTH AREA TEAM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kris Longshaw | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Peta Margaret Leigh | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Richard Cooke | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Jane McDonald | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Hallewell | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Dufton | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER CHARLES ALBON | Trustee | 25 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM SOULSBY | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
STUART MARTIN HODDINOTT | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ANN PEATE | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev DEBORAH JANE HODDINOTT | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Mary Eliza Todd | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDY WALSH | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev Adrian David Thompson | Trustee | 23 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOAN MARGARET INGRAMS | Trustee | 30 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
GARETH BROWNING | Trustee | 01 January 1990 |
|
|
||||
GILL DAVIDSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245.73k | £240.78k | £266.11k | £245.24k | £297.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £281.83k | £257.63k | £240.31k | £237.27k | £271.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.03k | £17.46k | £20.36k | N/A | £1.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Vicarage
Embleton
Cockermouth
CA13 9XL
- Phone:
- 01768776971
- Email:
- Allsaints@hoddinott.me
- Website:
-
Cockermouthareachurches.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window