Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FRIERN BARNET

Charity Number: 1133984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Bull Trustee 14 January 2025
None on record
Elvin Formosa Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Frances Jones Trustee 21 May 2023
FRIERN BARNET EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Kevin Kalawan Gujadhur Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Rev Dagmar Wilkinson Trustee 08 September 2021
LAWRENCE CAMPE'S ALMSHOUSE TRUST
Received: On time
FRIERN BARNET EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Barry Hall Trustee 09 May 2021
None on record
Fiona Cochrane Trustee 11 October 2020
LAWRENCE CAMPE'S ALMSHOUSE TRUST
Received: On time
Anthony Kuti Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Alison Springett Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Joyce Brand Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
John Kuti Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
CAROL LINDA LEVY Trustee
None on record