Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S ELY
Charity Number: 1133993

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Matthew Creber-Davies | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anneri Sanger | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
KEITH MARTIN RAWSON | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Woodbridge | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Sykes | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew William George Whittle | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Frances Rachel Taylor | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Phillip Edward Marsh | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Peter Brown | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Sayers | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Jayne Frost | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amy Elizabeth Philips | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janene Elise Pike | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Smyth | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Victoria Clare Lupson BSc Hons | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Daniel James Morley | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Mary Coutts MA MBACP | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM RUSSELL BISS | Trustee | 16 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Piers Andrew Coutts | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRISTINE JOAN WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN FRANCES MORLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.