THE ROYAL FOUNDATION OF THE PRINCE AND PRINCESS OF WALES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation is a philanthropic investor in three key areas, both in the United Kingdom and overseas: helping disadvantaged young people, supporting military veterans and their families, and promoting sustainable development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£7,968,305
Donations and legacies | £6.50m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £13.13k | |
Investments | £168.17k | |
Other | £1.29m |
Total expenditure:
£8,650,179
Raising funds | £1.15m | |
Charitable activities | £7.50m | |
Other | £0 |
£168,169 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.15m | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.50m |
People

48 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 8 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 3 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 October 2009: Standard registration
- THE ROYAL FOUNDATION (Working name)
- THE FOUNDATION OF PRINCE WILLIAM AND PRINCE HARRY (Previous name)
- THE ROYAL FOUNDATION OF THE DUKE AND DUCHESS OF CAMBRIDGE (Previous name)
- THE ROYAL FOUNDATION OF THE DUKE AND DUCHESS OF CAMBRIDGE AND PRINCE HARRY (Previous name)
- THE ROYAL FOUNDATION OF THE DUKE AND DUCHESS OF CAMBRIDGE AND THE DUKE AND DUCHESS OF SUSSEX (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Iain Patterson | Chair | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sir David John Lewis | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Ian John Patrick | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Garry White | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
PIPPA HARRIS | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Sir Rohinton Minoo Kalifa | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zeinab Mohammed-Khair Badawi-Malik | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alice Webb | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Jessica Wills | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.68m | £11.78m | £20.43m | £10.10m | £7.97m | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.34m | £9.16m | £16.36m | £14.97m | £8.65m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £50.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £6.61m | £11.62m | £19.95m | £9.57m | £6.50m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £32.80k | £140.27k | £442.43k | £221.94k | £13.13k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £37.27k | £10.11k | £464 | £68.50k | £168.17k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £50.60k | £36.49k | £236.87k | £1.29m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £1.46k | £183.07k | £13.69k | £5.66k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £8.16m | £8.35m | £15.13m | £14.15m | £7.50m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.19m | £808.66k | £1.23m | £814.77k | £1.15m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £205.32k | £135.12k | £140.93k | £173.37k | £131.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £4.10m | £3.73m | £6.03m | £7.03m | £558.28k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £7.76k | £4.91k | £4.68k | £4.57k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £23.79k | £17.53k | £28.64k | £55.94k | £131.09k | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.52m | £2.64m | £2.85m | £1.77m | £3.16m | |
|
Other assets | £3.73m | £6.24m | £16.33m | £6.45m | £4.54m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £805.26k | £687.57k | £6.71m | £750.81k | £880.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 JUN 2018 as amended on 06 Sep 2019 as amended on 08 Aug 2019 as amended on 20 Jun 2022 as amended on 10 Nov 2022 as amended on 10 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
KENSINGTON PALACE
PALACE GREEN
LONDON
W8 4PU
- Phone:
- 02071012963
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window