THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. NICHOLAS WITH ST. JOHN BAPTIST, LINCOLN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 02 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 01 December 2021: Funds received from 1038797 THE TAVERNE TRUST
- PCC OF ST NICHOLAS WITH ST JOHN, NEWPORT, LINCOLN (Working name)
- ST. NICHOLAS PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOAN BERESFORD | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elizabeth Wise | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas James | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Jane Ingleton | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neill Christopher Hepburn | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Carolyn Geraldine Jones | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Leslie Alan Moses | Trustee | 06 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Marie Osborne | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Arrand | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Frederick Gratrick | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Peter John Anthony Elsmore MA, PhD | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH ROGER HANSARD JP | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Sue Humphrey | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jacqueline Toogood | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Simmons | Trustee | 22 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA JOYCE GRATRICK | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Janet Christine Elsmore | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.02k | £164.71k | £167.59k | £81.80k | £160.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.35k | £9.07k | £8.74k | £80.71k | £108.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Nicholas Church
Newport
LINCOLN
LN1 3DP
- Phone:
- 01522806350
- Email:
- stnicholaslincoln@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window