NORTH WILTSHIRE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Resourcing body for local churches and support of mission at home and abroad
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

49 Trustee(s)
170 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 02 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- THE METHODIST CHURCH CHIPPENHAM (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
49 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor Durston | Trustee | 29 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Jane Foster | Trustee | 29 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Tucker | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anthony Ward Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Corinne Vivienne Wethers | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mark Barrett | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Dianne Joy Slater | Trustee | 28 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Mary Wylie | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Sharon Vatcher | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Albert James Venman | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bryant Victor Vincent | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Vivienne Franklin | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pete Armitage | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Vatcher | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Irene Collins | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert McMurdo Woods | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Geoffrey David Floyd | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard William Osbourne | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Stephen Francis Roe | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Clifford Michael Friend | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Gillian Osborne | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
George William Kennedy BSc MSc | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nathalie Catherine Marshall | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Bird | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Denise Morley | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Lawrence Harmer | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Mason Skinner LLB BA | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Henry Lyle CB FREng | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kay Ashlin | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Walley Kohn BA Cert Ed | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Graham Robert Crawshaw BADMSMCIPS | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Rhodes PhD BTh | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Julie Dawn Coe | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JAMES HOLDER | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ann Maria Allen | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne Durant | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Judith Furse | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Snyder FCCA | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anthony David Prichard | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Wilma Ann Goodfellow | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Peter Bernard Whittington | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Yvonne Margaret Dixon | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Thomson | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Gray | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STEPHEN DAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD JOHN WYNN WALTERS BVSCCTBR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LORNA JEAN COCKING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTANA JOY CLIFFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL ANTHONY WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £357.09k | £325.88k | £370.08k | £364.87k | £419.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £429.38k | £427.45k | £504.38k | £788.24k | £358.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND THE METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) AS AMENDED 30 JANUARY 2014
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
NWMC Office C/O: Studley Methodist Church
Studley Lane
Studley
Calne
Wiltshire
SN11 9NH
- Phone:
- 07498652837
- Email:
- circuitoffice@northwilts.me
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window