Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH WITH ST MARY'S SWINDON

Charity Number: 1134032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £240.35k £303.87k £307.30k £351.60k £383.54k
Total expenditure £265.49k £273.69k £355.95k £384.27k £390.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £34.10k £52.85k N/A N/A N/A