KIRKBY STEPHEN APPLEBY AND TEBAY METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of regular public acts of worship, open to members of the church and non members alike. Provision of sacred spaces (buildings) for prayer and contemplation. The teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

60 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 12 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
60 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev STEPHEN JOHN RADFORD | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||||||||
Ian Daniel Simkins | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
Julie Plank | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
James Peter Alcock | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Vivienne Cannon | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Linda Mary Alcock | Trustee | 10 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Martin Alan Ewin | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Joyce Worsfold | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
PAULINE CAPSTICK | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Susan Georgina Davis | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Penny Hilland | Trustee | 18 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Caroline Shaw | Trustee | 18 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Catherine Jane Thwaites | Trustee | 18 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Mary Elizabeth Kirkpatrick | Trustee | 18 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Anne Margaret Crosby | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Harry Hutchinson | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Richard Ewan McGregor | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Maureen Muriel Ewin | Trustee | 25 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Alistair Kirkpatrick | Trustee | 25 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
David Ireland Thackray | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Geoff Hodgson | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Molly Ingham | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Jacqueline Carol Betts | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Andrew John Sterling | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
MARGERY SARAH CANNON | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Dacre Swinbank | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Joanne Mary Boustead | Trustee | 16 June 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
David Russell Ewin | Trustee | 13 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Christine Marion Merritt | Trustee | 08 January 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
LINDA TAYLOR | Trustee | 11 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
BERYL ANNE BELL | Trustee | 11 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
JOHN WILLIAM THWAITES | Trustee | 25 September 2012 |
|
|||||||||||
JACQUELINE OUSBY | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rachel Anne Woof | Trustee | 13 December 2011 |
|
|||||||||||
VALERIE ELIZABETH WALTON | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
GLENDA BURTON MBE | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
MARGARET NOBLE COULTHARD | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
Christine Elizabeth Marston | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
WENDY MARY SWINBANK | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
THOMAS BERNARD STALEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
ROWLAND WOOF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
WILLIAM OUSBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
DAVID ASKEW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
MAURICE METCALFE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
Avril Swinbank | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
JEAN MARGARET METCALFE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
JOHN PRATT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
WILFRED CAPSTICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
JOHN BERNARD THORNBORROW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
MAUREEN MURIEL EWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
MICHAEL PAUL CAPSTICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
KENNETH IVAN BRUNSKILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
DAVID TREVOR BARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
GEORGE DEREK LAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
ALLEN HARRISON BURTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
MARGARET ELIZABETH COWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
JOHN MALCOLM THORNBORROW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
JEAN BRUNSKILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
Rev PHILIP RIGBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
DONALD MARSTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.34k | £202.69k | £171.62k | £128.36k | £128.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.99k | £162.68k | £143.03k | £182.07k | £182.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 September 2020 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 21 September 2020 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 12/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 04/07/2013
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 South Road
Kirkby Stephen
CA17 4SN
- Phone:
- 01768371202
- Email:
- ksatcircuit@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window