FRIENDS OF MILNROW PARISH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist in the care and provision of Milnrow Parish Church buildings and to improve the provision of facilities available to benefit the wide community of Milnrow.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Rochdale
Governance
- 24 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY COWLING | Chair |
|
|
|||||
WALTER TANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Andrew Harrison | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.05k | £47.99k | £53.27k | £70.11k | £76.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.99k | £36.17k | £30.45k | £113.56k | £43.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 199 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 199 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION 14 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE CARE AND PRESERVATION OF MILNROW PARISH CHURCH BUILDINGS AND TO IMPROVE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AVAILABLE TO BENEFIT THE WIDER COMMUNITY OF MILNROW.
Area of benefit
MILNROW
Contact information
- Address:
-
BANK HOUSE
71 DALE STREET
MILNROW
ROCHDALE
OL16 3NJ
- Phone:
- 01706868868
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window