THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF BARKING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary source of funds is the giving of Church Members and tax recovered from Gift Aid and donations. Additional regular sources of income are hall lettings, fees for weddings and funerals, fundraising income from events, and interests on reserves
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barking And Dagenham
Governance
- 03 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET WITH ST PATRICK BARKING (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mark Adams | Chair | 06 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
ANDREW EARWAKER | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Kanayo Omo | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Babajide Aina | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
LAWSON MGBUSS | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
JEBARAJ SOUNDEAPANDAN | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
LOLA SANWO | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||||
OLAKUNLE OLAIFA | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||||
Rev PAT NAPPIN | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Carol Brabender | Trustee | 16 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Cynthia Adams | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||
CAROLE WINGROVE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
EMMANUEL FAGBEMI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
IRENE EARWAKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DAVID JARVIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.67k | £55.60k | £45.42k | £100.48k | £126.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.05k | £77.32k | £76.12k | £152.05k | £127.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 November 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 November 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 19/06/2013
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARGARETS CHURCH
NORTH STREET
BARKING
IG11 8AS
- Phone:
- 02085942932
- Website:
-
stmargaretschurchbarking.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window