ST ANDREW'S CHEAM UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Charity is the advancement of the Christian faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the Scheme of Union of the United Reformed Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sutton
Governance
- 12 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST ANDREW'S CHEAM URC CHARITY (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Dudley Philippe | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANNE DICKINSON | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julie Jamgotchian | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Pheonah Musisi | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
NIGEL COLIN LOCK MACDONALD | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Rosemairi Evison | Trustee | 05 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Janette Walls | Trustee | 05 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Jennifer margaret Macdonald | Trustee | 29 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Rebecca Easton | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Craig Bowman | Trustee | 30 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Alan James Walls | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER SAINT | Trustee | 25 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Betty Ntow-Aninkora | Trustee | 26 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Nigel Dickinson | Trustee | 07 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £315.39k | £323.23k | £272.51k | £331.42k | £327.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £342.62k | £276.91k | £305.56k | £335.48k | £359.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.35k | £19.49k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTS DISTILLED FROM THE UNITED REFORM CHURCH ACTS OF PARLIAMENT (1971 AND 1982) AND THE SCHEME OF UNION (1972)
Charitable objects
The object of the Charity is the advancement of the Christian faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the Scheme of Union of the United Reformed Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Andrews United Reformed Church
Northey Avenue
Cheam
Sutton
SM2 7HF
- Phone:
- 02086425000
- Website:
-
standrews-cheam.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window