Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, DEREHAM

Charity number: 1133960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £99.87k £112.97k £111.14k £129.73k £133.22k
Total expenditure £99.90k £100.85k £116.38k £126.14k £124.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.24k N/A N/A