KT EDUCATIONAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1135017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advance for the public benefit in the UK the education of pupils in the French education system in particular but without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing, to provide premises and facilities for schools offering a French or a broader bilingual curriculum in the Kentish Town area or to provide assistance in establishing, maintaining, carrying on, managing and developing such schools.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 March 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • FRENCH EDUCATION PROPERTY TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Annabel Emma BLAIR Trustee 07 January 2025
WEMBLEY EDUCATIONAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
JACK MARIE HENRY DAVID BOWLES Trustee 09 May 2024
WEMBLEY EDUCATIONAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Benjamin Jacques Andre Michel Vedrenne-Cloquet Trustee 13 March 2024
COLLEGE FRANCAIS BILINGUE DE LONDRES LTD
Received: On time
WEMBLEY EDUCATIONAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
ARNAUD VAISSIE Trustee 12 May 2011
None on record
RICHARD FAIRBAIRN Trustee
FLUXUS ART PROJECTS
Received: On time
H N M DALSTON AND H F G DALSTON FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ASSOCIATION FOR LANGUAGE LEARNING
Received: On time
WEMBLEY EDUCATIONAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BRIDGET ESPINOSA MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
JEAN-PIERRE MUSTIER Trustee
THE ECOLE POLYTECHNIQUE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 32 days late
WEMBLEY EDUCATIONAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.69m £1.89m £1.86m £1.91m £1.88m
Total expenditure £1.09m £1.13m £1.33m £1.85m £3.50m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £27.00k £79.00k £86.00k £107.00k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.67m £1.72m £1.77m £1.80m £1.80m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £89.00k £11.00k £3.00k £78.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.09m £1.13m £1.33m £1.85m £3.50m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £33.00k £85.00k £97.00k £116.00k £145.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £330.00k £340.00k £547.00k £448.00k £200.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments £22.30m £27.70m £27.70m £27.09m £24.60m
Other assets £2.79m £2.92m £2.99m £3.05m £3.41m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £23.74m £23.12m £22.66m £22.05m £21.54m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
23 CROMWELL ROAD
LONDON
SW7 2EL
Phone:
02078713119
Website:

No information available