PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST THOMAS AND ST JOHN, BOLTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious: Promoting the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evengelistic, social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
Governance
- 01 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- LOSTOCK ST THOMAS & ST JOHN PCC (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Terry Clark | Chair | 31 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Justine Elizabeth Hatter | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Gereard Corr | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andre Aderemi Adefope | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Celia Joan Nisbett | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Lawson BSc | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Cecil Kavanagh BSc Eng | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey David Spencer | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suja Sarah Varghese | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel James Newton | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Corr | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kevan Porter | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA ELIZABETH MACPHERSON | Trustee | 23 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA CORNELIA ABRAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.91k | £79.35k | £92.35k | £99.10k | £103.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.81k | £86.27k | £110.46k | £117.75k | £109.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOSTOCK & DEANE CHURCH OFFICE
DEANE CHURCH CENTRE
41 Junction Road
BOLTON
BL3 4LT
- Phone:
- 01204659696
- Email:
- lostockchurch01@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window