THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, REDCLIFFE

Charity number: 1134120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

St Mary Redcliffe's mission is: Singing the song of faith and justice: as a thriving, inclusive Christian community; as a recognised, welcoming heritage destination; as a church that makes a difference in the parish and beyond; animated by a progressive, sustainable organisation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST MARY REDCLIFFE PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Reverend Canon Daniel Frank Tyndall Chair 01 April 2013
CHURCH LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
ST MARY REDCLIFFE WITH TEMPLE EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE MAJOR CHURCHES' NETWORK
Recently registered
THE TEMPLE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
ST THOMAS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
BRISTOL ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Joel Podolski Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Holly Amber Cook Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Rev Simon Goodman Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Jane Shepard Trustee 01 July 2024
IMMUNODEFICIENCY UK
Received: On time
Rev Laura Joanne Verrall-Kelly Trustee 08 March 2023
None on record
Samuel Patrick Sutherland Williams Trustee 21 February 2022
THE UNITED SOCIETY
Received: On time
MATTHEW HOWLING Trustee 05 October 2021
None on record
Belinda Phillipson Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
Liz Hewitt Trustee 05 October 2020
None on record
Esther Keller Trustee 05 October 2020
None on record
Richard Dyton Trustee 05 October 2020
CHURCH LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
ALEXANDRA KATHERINE NOTAY Trustee 29 April 2019
SUN SCREEN IT FOUNDATION LIMITED
Received: On time
CREATIVE LAND TRUST
Received: On time
Roma Widger Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Paul Bassett Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
ADAM DAVID LLOYD Trustee 26 November 2018
None on record
AURIOL SARAH BRITTON Trustee 01 August 2018
None on record
ELEANOR JANE VOUSDEN Trustee 24 April 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £767.11k £804.32k £789.50k £874.75k £984.10k
Total expenditure £699.39k £734.16k £711.70k £998.11k £1.03m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £50.00k £17.00k £38.66k £59.18k
Income - Donations and legacies £692.91k £771.74k £752.82k £811.93k £878.70k
Income - Other trading activities £39.44k £21.42k £18.62k £39.67k £75.81k
Income - Charitable activities £29.98k £6.69k £14.46k £19.73k £21.56k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £6.23k
Income - Investment £4.78k £4.47k £3.60k £3.43k £8.03k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £38.49k £11.33k £122.70k £0 £174.01k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £678.04k £724.66k £701.49k £962.76k £979.85k
Expenditure - Raising funds £21.35k £9.49k £10.21k £16.94k £25.39k
Expenditure - Governance £12.38k £57.26k £43.97k £17.43k £28.46k
Expenditure - Grants institution £5.00k £0 £0 £18.45k £11.97k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £18.42k £26.76k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £709.33k £709.26k £708.76k £710.64k £715.06k
Long-term investments £153.22k £163.90k £99.78k £87.78k £96.08k
Other assets £365.07k £349.41k £499.17k £420.97k £549.11k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £121.94k £36.05k £24.08k £71.12k £77.56k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
12 Colston Parade
BRISTOL
BS1 6RA
Phone:
01172310060