THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, WIGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

22 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 05 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY'S PCC, WIGTON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND RICHARD TOM CORRIE | Chair | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Turner | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Verona Thomlinson | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Helen Jean Armstrong | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID THOMAS SHINGLER ATCL | Trustee | 07 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
JEAN MONKHOUSE | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Johnson | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr STEPHEN HARALDSEN | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Snape BA | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Huntington | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MATTINSON | Trustee | 14 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY-ANN WALSH | Trustee | 14 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRONJA TWENTYMAN | Trustee | 14 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LOMAS | Trustee | 30 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE PEACOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER HOWARD WALFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOROTHY MCCRACKEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER STEEL PEACOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AUDREY FRIZELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN EDWARD SNAPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID SHINGLER | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANNE LOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.80k | £70.62k | £71.68k | £84.83k | £86.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.07k | £62.27k | £69.02k | £79.93k | £80.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £427 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Deer Park
WIGTON
Cumbria
CA7 9ND
- Phone:
- 01697343862
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window