THE FRIENDS OF THE STAFFORDSHIRE & WEST MIDLANDS (NORTH SECTOR) ARMY CADET FORCE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports this regional Army Cadet Force, they being part of a national youth organisation that aims to inspire young people to achieve success in their lives, through partaking in challenging adventurous, community and military activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 17 December 2009: Standard registration
- SWM (NS) ACF FRIENDS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Dale | Chair | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Kate Amphlet | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Toby Henry McIntosh Gaddum | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Louise Hawley | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Khuram | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Shannon Jayne Phillips | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Hurley | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Edward Farnell-Smith | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Col 'Retd' K J Knutton OBE | Trustee | 07 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Farmer | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruby Nagi | Trustee | 17 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM MORLEY DL | Trustee | 05 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN SMITH | Trustee | 09 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.97k | £8.39k | £7.86k | £14.48k | £20.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.82k | £9.07k | £1.18k | £8.29k | £14.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 01 DEC 2009
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN THE DUTIES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP FOR YOUNG PERSONS IN THE STAFFORDSHIRE & WEST MIDLANDS (NORTH SECTOR) ARMY CADET FORCE AND TO HELP SUCH YOUNG PERSONS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITY
Area of benefit
STAFFORDSHIRE AND WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ministry Of Defence
Building 115
Beacon Barracks
Beaconside
STAFFORD
ST18 0AQ
- Phone:
- 07909006733
- Email:
- admin@staffsacffriends.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window