Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHARLES WITH ST. MATTHIAS, PLYMOUTH
Charity number: 1134139

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Selwyn Jeba | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bull | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adam Taylor | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Pearson | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Louis Winstone | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Radu Ciubotarasu | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Marks | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alston Chan | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Graham Stirling | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sophie Chatten | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Steve Campion | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Phillips | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy McCusker | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Wilson | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Stephenson | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Knight | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Bowker | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.