THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HINDHEAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of St Alban's, Hindhead is to provide a community to enable people to worship God, to develop their faith, and to build up a sense of community within the parish of Hindhead.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 11 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST ALBANS HINDHEAD PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neill Michael Parsons | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Thompson | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Maybury | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Lucinda Willows | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bodle | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Radek Uzel | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jung Framji Daruvala | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Willows | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Sally Winifred Elliott | Trustee | 23 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA GAMBLE | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
REV RICHARD TALBOT BODLE | Trustee |
|
||||||
RICHARD WILLIAM MAYBURY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £303.00k | £133.59k | £197.40k | £195.36k | £217.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.61k | £180.58k | £160.84k | £208.32k | £199.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. ALBANS VICARAGE
WOOD ROAD
HINDHEAD
GU26 6PX
- Phone:
- 01428 607818
- Website:
-
stalbanshindhead.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window