THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EPSOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary object of the Parochial Church Council (PCC) is the promotion of the Gospel of our Lord Jesus Christ according to the doctrines and practices of the Church of England. The PCC (Powers) Measure 1956 states that the PCC "is to co-operate with the minister in promoting in the parish the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 05 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARTIN OF TOURS WITH ST STEPHEN ON THE DOWNS PCC,EPSOM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD NICHOLAS ANTHONY PARISH | Chair | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Alyson Aronson | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lynne Scholefield | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Woodhead | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lutton | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Rennie | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Roberts | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Henry Jeffery | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy John Padwick | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Lutton | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jeffery | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Williams | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JAMES KEITH | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR HOWARD BLUETT | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ANNE MITCHELL | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £295.03k | £284.12k | £286.03k | £299.95k | £299.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £345.44k | £293.06k | £295.38k | £267.24k | £350.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.39k | £26.18k | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 March 2022 | 130 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 March 2022 | 130 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parish Office
Church House
St Martin's Church
Church Road
Epsom
KT17 4PX
- Phone:
- 01372722567
- Email:
- office@stmartinsepsom.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window