ORIEL MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith in accordance with the Statement of Beliefs and to advance the education of young people through the development of their mental, physical and moral capabilities through multi sensory activities in schools. To promote and fulfil such other charitable purposes beneficial to the community focusing on young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
- Cornwall
- Derbyshire
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 17 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Margaret Krolik | Chair | 19 November 2013 |
|
|||||
Stephen Howard | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Grace Forsyth | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Marion Quinn | Trustee | 21 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Buckley | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steve Ovens | Trustee | 06 May 2014 |
|
|||||
Ed Krolik | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.97k | £74.03k | £169.00k | £108.87k | £94.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.60k | £39.29k | £76.13k | £112.71k | £107.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
A TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO ATTACHED IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT B TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND MORAL CAPABILITIES THROUGH MULTI SENSORY ACTIVITIES IN SCHOOLS IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT C TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Southgate Technology Park
Pennygillam Way
Pennygillam Industrial Estate
Launceston
Cornwall
PL15 7ED
- Phone:
- 07590387531
- Email:
- nikki@orielministries.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window