THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR YOUTH JUSTICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The National Association for Youth Justice is a membership organization which seeks to promote the welfare and protect the rights of children and young people involved in the youth justice system in England and Wales, to which end it provides advice, training and information to members, supporters and others who support its aims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 27 September 2010: Standard registration
- NAYJ (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ali Wigzell | Chair | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Laura Riley | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Peace | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Brown | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jo Staines | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Janes | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew Peaden | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Samantha Burns | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kirstine Szifris | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr CLAIRE PATERSON-YOUNG | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE EVANS | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mary O'shaughnessy | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ross Little | Trustee | 15 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR TIM BATEMAN | Trustee | 29 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.55k | £2.80k | £2.26k | £1.64k | £2.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.13k | £3.04k | £2.64k | £1.87k | £2.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 SEPTEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15 JUN 2021 as amended on 15 Jun 2020 as amended on 27 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE (AS SET OUT IN THE FULL RANGE OF INTERNATIONAL STANDARDS, TREATIES, RULES, CONVENTIONS AND GUIDELINES THEREON, INCLUDING THE UN CONVENTION ON THE RIGHTS OF THE CHILD AND ALL RELATED UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD ¨ AND IN PARTICULAR WITHIN ENGLAND AND WALES - BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: = MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; = OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; = RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; = RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; = PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; = CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; = COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; = RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; = PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; = PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; = INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; = ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mayo House
Llangammarch Wells
LD4 4EF
- Phone:
- 01591620322
- Email:
- info@thenayj.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window