RIBBLE VALLEY JAZZ & BLUES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Mission-We will promote & develop cultural, economic & social benefits of jazz & blues in North West. We will: 1.Create a thriving jazz&blues community 2. Prioritise young people performing & appreciating 3.Facilitate enjoyment & appreciation of jazz&blues 4. Encourage sharing knowledge, information & skills 5. Work with organisations with a mutual interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 16 September 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phil Baugh | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DRURY | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Analisa Smith | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tom Ainsworth | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip James Lee | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ivana Douglas | Trustee | 25 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Lowes | Trustee | 25 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Walters | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Miles Alexander Peachey | Trustee | 20 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.81k | £37.92k | £40.44k | £33.17k | £49.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.08k | £22.55k | £26.84k | £58.85k | £53.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.85k | £21.33k | £33.51k | £1.00k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1. TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS, EVENTS, WORKSHOPS AND FESTIVALS; 2. TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR (A) SUPPORTING THE PARTICIPATION BY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN ANY FORM OF JAZZ AND BLUES MUSIC AND (B) THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Radeclyffe Street
CLITHEROE
Lancashire
BB7 2HL
- Phone:
- 07807944031
- Email:
- info@rvjazzandblues.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window