Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT CROSBY ST FAITH

Charity number: 1134518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £101.33k £97.83k £254.53k £112.11k £67.53k
Total expenditure £72.61k £95.86k £131.73k £130.82k £176.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £450 N/A