38 DEGREES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
38 Degrees Trust will make grants to other organisations in line with the Trust's objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 December 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BENEDICT SOUTHWORTH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
LAWRENCE DAVID SIMANOWITZ | Trustee | 21 October 2011 |
|
|||||
PETER TYSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WARREN PUCKETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £886 | £4.66k | £2.45k | £1.75k | £105.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £910 | £1.79k | £1.06k | £68.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 11 October 2022 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 October 2022 | 438 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 October 2020 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 OCTOBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 DECEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY 3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: (A) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES; (D) THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP OR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT BY SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT; (E) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE, HERITAGE OR SCIENCE BY SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT; (F) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HUMAN RIGHTS, CONFLICT RESOLUTION OR RECONCILIATION OR THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS OR RACIAL HARMONY OR EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT; (G) THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OR IMPROVEMENT; (H) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND (I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANIMAL WELFARE BY SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bates Wells Braithwaite
Thames Exchange
10 Queen Street Place
London
EC4R 1BE
- Phone:
- 0207 8460 093
- Email:
- contact@38degreestrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window