COMBINED CHARITIES FUND FOR THE MENTALLY HANDICAPPED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Quarterly meetings of trustees to decide on the distribution of funds from interest on capital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 16 August 1972: Standard registration
- 04 May 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 04 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1158881 WILTON RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
- 04 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1011774 DEVIZES AND DISTRICT OPPORTUNITY CENTRE
- 04 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1113751 WILTSHIRE MIND
- 04 May 2023: Funds transferred to 801343 BEAT (FORMERLY EATING DISORDERS ASSOCIATION)
- 04 May 2023: Funds transferred to 305931 1ST LAVINGTON SEA SCOUT GROUP
- 04 May 2023: Funds transferred to 282543 DEVIZES AND DISTRICT PHAB CLUB
- 04 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1019971 DEVIZES AND DISTRICT LINK
- 04 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1104284 THE MONDAY CLUB DEVIZES
- 04 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1174506 EASTERTON, MARKET LAVINGTON AND URCHFONT LINK GOOD...
- 04 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1026160 WILTSHIRE MUSIC CENTRE TRUST LTD
- 04 May 2023: Funds transferred to 305927 1ST DEVIZES SCOUT GROUP
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.30k | £2.57k | £1.98k | £2.56k | £2.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.54k | £3.86k | £1.35k | £0 | £700 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED THE 19 NOVEMBER 1971
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE MATERIAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELFARE OF PERSONS PRIMARILY CHILDREN WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL ILLNESS ARRESTED OR INCOMPLETE DEVELOPMENT OF MIND. PSYCHOPTHIC DISORDER OR ANY OTHER DISORDER OR DISABILITY OF MIND AND IN PARTICULAR (A)BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY, CLOTHING OR OTHERWISE TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH PERSONS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1 OF THE DEED)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE BRIMINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window