Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN AND ST WULSTAN, SELLY PARK, BIRMINGHAM

Charity Number: 1135051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £325.59k £324.55k £364.73k £346.54k £378.39k
Total expenditure £339.40k £336.49k £337.29k £375.96k £347.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A