LLANSAMLET PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 07 April 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev GERAINT DAVID WATHAN | Chair | 25 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Raymond John Winchester | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Alison Mary Rita Rees | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Mann | Trustee | 16 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Mathewson | Trustee | 16 April 2017 |
|
|||||
JEFFREY WILLIAM JONES | Trustee | 16 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Jean Davies | Trustee | 16 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Usher | Trustee | 12 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Walters | Trustee | 12 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEAN PALMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RACHEL WELLS | Trustee |
|
||||||
HELEN MOIRA BIBBY | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARILYN ANN REES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EIRA ELIZABETH MATHEWSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN ANN BOWEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.79k | £130.44k | £83.72k | £666.13k | £125.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.18k | £134.73k | £97.05k | £661.97k | £192.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £65.54k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.04k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.75k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £575.79k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £661.97k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 March 2025 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 March 2025 | 144 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 March 2024 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 March 2024 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 February 2024 | 480 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 February 2024 | 480 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 138 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2021 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2021 | 147 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MARCH 1920
Charitable objects
The promotion of the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical, in the parish.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Samlet's Church
Church Road
Llansamlet
SWANSEA
- Phone:
- 01792 798845
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window