METHODIST ACTION (NORTH WEST) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to promote for the public benefit any charitable purpose connected with community development, regeneration in areas of social and economic deprivation, with particular emphasis on the needs of the inhabitants in the North West.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Total income:
£1,867,203
Donations and legacies | £73.51k | |
Charitable activities | £1.76m | |
Other trading activities | £31.50k | |
Investments | £414 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,134,376
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.13m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £297,107 from government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.76k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.13m |
People

20 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Blackburn With Darwen
- Lancashire
Governance
- 28 June 2010: Standard registration
- METHODIST ACTION (PRESTON IN CENTRAL LANCASHIRE) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMANDA ELIZABETH LATHAM BA, ACA | Chair |
|
||||||
REV KENNETH GEORGE WALTON C.I.H., P.G.C.E., M.A., | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hart | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Tyson | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER LUMSDEN | Trustee | 08 August 2012 |
|
|||||
JOHN KENVYN WALES BED MA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.25m | £3.10m | £2.46m | £1.95m | £1.87m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.53m | £2.61m | £2.03m | £2.34m | £2.13m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £585.82k | £327.29k | £297.11k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £606.01k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £29.44k | £61.32k | £43.02k | £188.80k | £73.51k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £343.63k | £13.67k | £4.34k | £12.66k | £31.50k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £869.22k | £3.02m | £2.42m | £1.74m | £1.76m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.27k | £610 | £481 | £577 | £414 | |
|
Income - Other | £1.16k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.13m | £2.58m | £1.99m | £2.34m | £2.13m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £558 | £5.76k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.15k | £20.71k | £33.72k | £34.80k | £22.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £26.93k | £565.22k | £937.60k | £548.90k | £233.43k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £223.50k | £291.06k | £429.97k | £349.12k | £354.08k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £172.81k | £214.43k | £287.34k | £228.04k | £184.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/02/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT, REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION AND RELIEVING NEED BROUGHT ABOUT BY POVERTY, DISTRESS, SICKNESS AND ANY FORM OF DISABILITY OR DEPRIVATION, WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON THE NEEDS OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREAS IN THE METHODIST CHURCH DISTRICTS OF LANCASHIRE, CUMBRIA, BOLTON & ROCHDALE, CHESTER & STOKE-ON-TRENT, LIVERPOOL, MANCHESTER & STOCKPORT AND ANY SURROUNDING AREAS BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; (B) TO PROMOTE EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES WITH SPECIAL EMPHASIS ON PROVIDING ACCESS TO SUCH OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE BY REASON OF SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE OTHERWISE UNABLE TO GAIN SUCH ACCESS; (C) TO PROVIDE ADVICE, INFORMATION AND ASSISTANCE IN RELATION TO CITIZENSHIP SO AS TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND POTENTIAL OF INDIVIDUALS AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED; (D) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH OF THOSE WHO ARE IN DANGER OF BECOMING ADDICTED TO OR DEPENDENT UPON OR THOSE WHO HAVE ALREADY BECOME SO ADDICTED OR DEPENDENT UPON LEGAL OR ILLEGAL DRUGS OF ANY DESCRIPTION; (E) TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT BY THE: (I) PROVISION OF ADVICE TRAINING FOR UNEMPLOYED INDIVIDUALS CONCERNING UNEMPLOYMENT, SELF-EMPLOYMENT, AND THE ESTABLISHMENT OF CO-OPERATIVE ENTERPRISES AND THE PROVISION OF CV WRITING, JOB SEARCH AND THE JOB CLUB FACILITIES FOR THEM; (II) PROVISION OF PRACTICAL SUPPORT TO UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE BY WAY OF ACCOMMODATION; (F) TO RELIEVE HOUSING NEED BY: (A) THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, ADVICE, INFORMATION, ASSISTANCE AND REPRESENTATION TO THOSE IN CIRCUMSTANCES OF HOUSING NEED; (B) FACILITATING THE PROVISION AND IMPROVEMENT OF PUBLIC SECTOR HOUSING THROUGH CO-OPERATION AND PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER AGENCIES; (G) TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED THROUGH CO-OPERATION AND PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER AGENCIES; (H) TO RELIEVE POVERTY; (I) TO PROTECT, ENHANCE AND CONSERVE THE ENVIRONMENT; (J) TO PROMOTE PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; (K) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE COMMISSION.
Area of benefit
PRESTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYCE PEELING GREEN
THE COPPER ROOM
DEVA CITY OFFICE PARK
TRINITY WAY
SALFORD
M3 7BG
- Phone:
- 0161 608 0000
- Email:
- TCHAN@RPG.CO.UK
- Website:
-
WWW.RPGBUSINESSRECOVERY.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window