Financial history Cambridge United Foundation Limited

Charity number: 1137275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £266.66k £287.12k £512.35k £488.27k £929.85k
Total expenditure £258.82k £286.88k £484.24k £570.42k £598.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.78k £23.83k £16.71k £12.50k £30.23k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £89.69k N/A £741.41k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £262.84k N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £159.81k N/A £188.44k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £433.58k N/A £559.12k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £50.67k N/A £39.25k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £575 N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0