THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH BARNSTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Teaching and promotion of Christianity and the whole mission of the church through sermons, courses, patoral work, the staging of events and meetings and distribution of literature. Support to other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,700 from 1 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wirral
Governance
- 27 April 2010: Previously excepted registration
- BARNSTON PCC (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Christopher Richard Slater | Chair | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Cox Brassey | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Jean Bird | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane McCallum | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Jane Francis | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Tolley | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Norma Jordan | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Elizabeth Mountford BA Hons | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Rowland Hill | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alan Robert Johnston | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
David John Reed | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
LOIS JOY MILLINGTON | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|||||
PROF ROBERT JOHN MOOTS | Trustee | 29 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT PETER JARVIS | Trustee | 24 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £702.97k | £284.08k | £228.59k | £396.93k | £221.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £270.96k | £289.94k | £284.39k | £358.82k | £289.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.35k | £600 | N/A | £7.40k | £3.70k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £678.06k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £22.37k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £487.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £206.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £64.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £300 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £17.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barnston Parish Hall
85 Barnston Road
Heswall
WIRRAL
Merseyside
CH61 1BW
- Phone:
- 01516482404
- Email:
- treasurer@barnston.info
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window