BROCKWELL PARK MANAGEMENT ADVISORY COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The MAC is LB Lambeth's co-operative community partner for the ongoing management and restoration of Brockwell Park. It represents the needs and wishes of park users and stakeholders in discussions with Lambeth about their strategic objectives and aims to increase the use and enjoyment of the Park by local residents. It works to preserve and enhance the Park and to improve its bio-diversity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £31,995 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lambeth
- Southwark
Governance
- 29 July 2010: Standard registration
- BROCKWELL PARK COMMUNITY PARTNERS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR ANN KINGSBURY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Richard Alan Wrigley | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul McGlone | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|||||
DEREK HOARE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.61k | £927 | £4.47k | £9.12k | £34.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £878 | £2.01k | £278 | £5.39k | £36.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £32.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/06/2004 AS AMENDED ON 13/07/2010 AS AMENDED ON 10/11/2011 AS AMENDED ON 19/01/2014
Charitable objects
THE BROCKWELL PARK MAC IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE AREA KNOWN AS BROCKWELL PARK, LOCATED IN THE LONDON SE24 POSTAL DISTRICT (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') FOR THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSE: TO PRESERVE, CONSERVE, MAINTAIN, ENHANCE AND PROMOTE THE AREA OF BENEFIT'S NATURAL BEAUTY, HERITAGE AND ECOLOGY, WHILST ACHIEVING A BALANCE BETWEEN THE NEEDS AND WISHES OF ITS USERS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITY THAT OWNS AND MANAGES IT AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH STATEMENTS SET OUT IN THE ATTACHED VISION STATEMENT (SEE ANNEX 1 TO THIS CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
THE BROCKWELL PARK MAC
Contact information
- Address:
-
87 ROSENDALE ROAD
LONDON
SE21 8EZ
- Phone:
- +44 7949 829865
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window