WEY VALLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity Number: 1137300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are primarily an administrative body overseeing the activities of 13 churches including 2 LEPs and 1 shared church which provide worship opportunities, youth/luncheon clubs, pastoral care/support for local charities. Church premises are used by the community and third-party organisations e.g. uniformed organisations, playgroups, NCT, dance schools etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £425,752
Total expenditure: £380,053

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 August 2010: Previously excepted registration
  • 08 August 2017: Funds received from 1132730 GUILDFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • WOKING & WALTON ON THAMES METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

47 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Nigel Campion-Smith Trustee 01 September 2022
GUILDFORD TOWN CENTRE CHAPLAINCY
Received: On time
GUILDFORD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
ESUUBI TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY WITH SAINT MARY
Received: On time
Rev Robert Lloyd Cotton Trustee 01 September 2022
BLAKE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Paul Stuart GLASS Trustee 01 September 2022
TRINITY METHODIST CHURCH WOKING
Received: On time
THE LEYS AND ST FAITH'S SCHOOLS FOUNDATION
Received: 11 days late
Rosemary Anne Lee Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Linda Macbeth Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Rev Claire Olivia Hargreaves Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Rev George Kwesi Quarm Trustee 01 September 2021
SHEERWATER CHURCHES LIMITED
Received: On time
Cecilia Lee Kim-Ford Trustee 01 March 2021
None on record
Pamela Ann Bailey Trustee 01 March 2021
None on record
Julie Anne Wallis Trustee 01 March 2021
None on record
John David Bailey Trustee 01 March 2021
None on record
Naomi Patricia Belli Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Rev Samantha Elizabeth Funnell Trustee 01 September 2020
TRINITY METHODIST CHURCH WOKING
Received: On time
Rev Adam Payne Trustee 01 September 2020
GODALMING UNITED CHURCH (METHODIST & UNITED REFORMED)
Received: 2 days late
Julie Anne Rowling Trustee 01 September 2020
GODALMING UNITED CHURCH (METHODIST & UNITED REFORMED)
Received: 2 days late
Margaret Louise Ireland Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Louise Pauline Steele Trustee 01 September 2020
GODALMING UNITED CHURCH (METHODIST & UNITED REFORMED)
Received: 2 days late
Frederick William Rowe Trustee 16 July 2020
None on record
Andrea Jean Campion-Smith Trustee 01 September 2019
GUILDFORD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev Peter Lawrence Hills Trustee 01 September 2018
SHEERWATER CHURCHES LIMITED
Received: On time
Helen Elizabeth Belsham BSc Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Revd Sydney Samuel Lake Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Vaughan Starkey Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
David Maxwell Paterson Trustee 01 March 2017
WALTON-ON-THAMES METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Adriaan Berrevoets Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
REV John Allan Taylor Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Robert Grenville Lewis Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Linda Margaret Todd Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Margaret Woolcock CQSW Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Rev David Duncan Faulkner BA MPhil Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Michael Laurence Lee Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Rev Barrie Wesley Tabraham Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Peter Francis Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Linda Louise Weedon Trustee 01 September 2016
THE METHODIST CHURCH: SOUTH-EAST DISTRICT
Received: On time
SUSAN WADDELL Trustee 01 September 2016
TRINITY METHODIST CHURCH WOKING
Received: On time
LYNDA SHORE Trustee 01 September 2016
BROOKWOOD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Received: On time
David Lander Trustee 01 September 2016
SHEERWATER CHURCHES LIMITED
Received: On time
TRINITY METHODIST CHURCH WOKING
Received: On time
Allison Jackson Trustee 01 September 2016
TRINITY METHODIST CHURCH WOKING
Received: On time
John Nelson Trustee 01 September 2016
TRINITY METHODIST CHURCH WOKING
Received: On time
Jean Normington Trustee 01 September 2016
TRINITY METHODIST CHURCH WOKING
Received: On time
Carole Steele Trustee 01 September 2016
MAYBURY AND SHEERWATER COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
SHEERWATER CHURCHES LIMITED
Received: On time
Alan Steele Trustee 01 September 2016
GODALMING BAND
Received: On time
GODALMING UNITED CHURCH (METHODIST & UNITED REFORMED)
Received: 2 days late
DUNCAN ERIC VEITCH CURTIS Trustee 01 September 2016
WALTON-ON-THAMES METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Ross John Richardson Trustee 01 September 2016
WALTON-ON-THAMES METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Eileen McCallum MacDonald BA Dip Ed Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Carol June Smith Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Margaret Joan Faulkner Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £401.40k £420.24k £394.00k £394.42k £425.75k
Total expenditure £458.18k £699.50k £452.23k £481.16k £380.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 01 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 01 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 10 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 10 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 July 2022 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 06 July 2022 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 09 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Circuit Office
Merrow Methodist Church
Bushy Hill Drive
GUILDFORD
GU1 2SH
Phone:
07808046451