CHADLINGTON VILLAGE GREEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The conservation and preservation of land in an Area of Outstanding Natural Beauty (AONB) and the promotion of the diversification of flora and fauna.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 27 October 2010: Standard registration
- 04 April 2019: Funds received from 1144073 THE DEAN TRUST
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Ridpath | Trustee | 15 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN CHAPMAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
philip Godfrey | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £325 | £325 | £326 | £329 | £329 | |
|
Total expenditure | £294 | £153 | £15 | £60 | £262 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 FEBRUARY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 19 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY TO THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE GREEN FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF CHADLINGTON, OXFORDSHIRE, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
MILL HOUSE
MILL END
CHADLINGTON
CHIPPING NORTON
OX7 3NY
- Phone:
- 01608676059
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window