POPLAR MOSQUE AND COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities for the religious, spiritual and educational needs of the local Muslim community of Blackwell Reach and the neighbouring areas. To improve social and educational health and economic condition of the local community regardless of their background. Co-operate and collaborate with other communities and organisations to work for the common good and to enhance community cohesion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 22 June 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amran Hussain | Trustee | 26 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sam Samad Hussain | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Somir Uddin | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Lilu Miah | Trustee | 21 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Nurul Amin | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Haji Shafique Hoque | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.95k | £94.13k | £128.04k | £143.85k | £142.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.16k | £52.98k | £47.34k | £42.13k | £43.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 February 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
04 February 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 April 2021 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
14 April 2021 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
OBJECTS: A). TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION B). TO ORGANISE AND PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION C). TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY D). TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE ACTIVITIES WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Poplar Mosque & Community Centre
6 Webber Path
LONDON
E14 0FZ
- Phone:
- 020 7515 5680
- Email:
- sabbr2019@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window