SOUTHFIELD CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday Family Services, including activities for children and young people. Women's Meeting, a Ladies Prayer Group, times of Prayer, Praise and Fellowship, Home Care Groups, and a Ladies Book Group. Use of building for "Mother & Toddler", singers, a signing activity for babies, a club for 7-11 year olds, and for children's birthday parties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Somerset
Governance
- 09 June 2010: Standard registration
- SOUTHFIELD CHURCH LIMITED (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Jean Bexon | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Bexon | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Graham Lloyd Jones | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|||||
KIN TUNG LEONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT ANDREW CLATWORTHY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.09k | £41.31k | £46.42k | £52.64k | £62.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.11k | £47.01k | £39.74k | £44.38k | £62.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 APRIL 2010 as amended on 11 Apr 2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE TRADITION OF AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH. THESE ARE ITS CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE 2006 ACT. FOR AS LONG AS THE CHARITY IS REGISTERED AS A CHARITY IN ENGLAND AND WALES, ITS PURPOSES MAY ONLY BE ALTERED WITH THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE COMMISSION AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY CONDITIONS ATTACHED TO SUCH CONSENT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 ROCK AVENUE
NAILSEA
BRISTOL
BS48 2AJ
- Phone:
- 01275854575
- Email:
- clat@blueyonder.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window