TRIPLE 'H' TRUST

Charity number: 1136750
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides underprivileged and at risk children aged 6 to 13 years living in areas suffering high indices of disadvantage, with emotional support, confidential advice and respite through the medium of supported small group holidays.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 28 February 2022

Total income: £14,738
Total expenditure: £19,706

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 July 2010: Standard registration
  • 14 October 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
  • 14 October 2022: Funds transferred to 1075201 THE BRISTOL ENSEMBLE LTD
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £21.20k £28.30k £37.43k £16.05k £14.74k
Total expenditure £26.33k £24.34k £29.13k £12.02k £19.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2022 06 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 23 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 14 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 14 September 2020 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2019 12 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 12 September 2019 On Time