Financial history YELLOW SUBMARINE HOLIDAYS

Charity number: 1136735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £796.44k £804.67k £792.98k £955.75k £989.89k
Total expenditure £793.97k £670.35k £807.04k £997.60k £1.07m
Income from government contracts £145.49k £146.00k £146.41k £146.82k £78.09k
Income from government grants £110.64k £125.51k £11.75k £11.15k £1.60k
Income - Donations and legacies £163.28k £432.99k £289.05k £287.08k £470.88k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £556.11k £264.36k £500.64k £668.10k £767.45k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £250.00k
Income - Investment £501 £118 £33 £570 £1.56k
Income - Other £76.55k £107.20k £3.25k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £791.37k £670.12k £805.92k £991.22k £1.06m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.60k £234 £1.12k £6.38k £7.74k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0